McAllister Towing of New York, LLC et al v. M/V Nor Goliath
Plaintiff: Central Boat Rentals, Inc., Global Towing Service, LLC, McAllister Towing of New York, LLC and Offshore Towing, Inc.
Defendant: M/V Nor Goliath
Case Number: 1:2019cv00675
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT: Ordered that this civil action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 11/4/19. (RLW)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Response to Order re #10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/10/19 (HM) filed by Central Boat Rentals, Inc., Global Towing Service, LLC, McAllister Towing of New York, LLC, Offshore Towing, Inc. (Dragna, Gerard)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/10/19 (HM)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andre J. Mouledoux; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Trevor M. Cutaiar. Andre J. Mouledoux and Trevor M. Cutaiar are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/8/2019 (AB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Dragna, Gerard)
October 2, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7: Incorrect document attached. This docket entry should be disregarded. Attorney is directed to refile and attach the correct pdf document. Attorney is also advised to include the judge assignment after the case number. (RLW)
October 2, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 thru #7: Attorney is advised to include the judge assignment of HSO-JCG after the case number on future filed pleadings. See previous annotation entered on 10/1/19. (RLW)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Offshore Towing, Inc. (Dragna, Gerard)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Corporate Disclosure Statement by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Dragna, Gerard) Modified on 10/2/2019 (RLW).
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Towing Service, LLC (Dragna, Gerard)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Boat Rentals, Inc. (Dragna, Gerard)
October 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2, #3, and #4: (1) Attorney is advised to include the judge assignment of HSO-JCG on future filed pleadings; and (2) Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2: Advising attorney that the Warrant should not have been attached as an attachment. If Motion is granted, attorney is advised to contact the Clerk's Office for instructions for providing the Warrant to the Clerk's Office for issuance. (RLW)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Trevor M. Cutaiar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4103369) by Central Boat Rentals, Inc., Global Towing Service, LLC, McAllister Towing of New York, LLC, Offshore Towing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Dragna, Gerard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Andre J. Mouledoux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4103350) by Central Boat Rentals, Inc., Global Towing Service, LLC, McAllister Towing of New York, LLC, Offshore Towing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Dragna, Gerard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Central Boat Rentals, Inc., Global Towing Service, LLC, McAllister Towing of New York, LLC, Offshore Towing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Dragna, Gerard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V Nor Goliath (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4102016), filed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC, Central Boat Rentals, Inc., Global Towing Service, LLC, Offshore Towing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - McAllister Towing Charter Docs, #2 Exhibit B - McAllister Towing Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - McAllister-Dan Bunkering Assignment, #4 Exhibit D - Central Boats Charter Docs, #5 Exhibit E - Central Boats Invoices, #6 Exhibit F - Offshore Towing Invoices, #7 Exhibit G - Offshore Towing Tug Logs, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister Towing of New York, LLC et al v. M/V Nor Goliath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Boat Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux - PHV
Represented By: Trevor M. Cutaiar - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Towing Service, LLC
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux - PHV
Represented By: Trevor M. Cutaiar - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McAllister Towing of New York, LLC
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux - PHV
Represented By: Trevor M. Cutaiar - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Offshore Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux - PHV
Represented By: Trevor M. Cutaiar - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Nor Goliath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?