Lee v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kayla M. Lee
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00678
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 11/1/2019, answer due 1/30/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney. (wld)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Kayla M. Lee. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 10/25/2019, answer due 1/23/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (JCH)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wld)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/7/19 (CCO)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DIRECTING CLERK. Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the U.S. District Clerk is hereby authorized and directed to receive and file the Complaint in this action without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/7/19 (CCO)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/4/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kayla M. Lee (JCH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Kayla M. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla M. Lee
Represented By: Hannalore Burns Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?