Meyer v. Memorial Hospital at Gulfport Foundation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Casie Meyer
Defendant: Memorial Hospital at Gulfport Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00700
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jean Sutton Martin shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the plaintiff Casie Meyer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 9, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
December 6, 2019 Attorneys should use the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:19cv700HSO-RHW. (wld)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/5/2019 (wld)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Jean Sutton Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155520) by Casie Meyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Graves, William)
October 11, 2019 Issued summons mailed to attorney to address listed on docket/summons.(JCH)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Memorial Hospital at Gulfport Foundation, Inc. (JCH)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Memorial Hospital at Gulfport Foundation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4112524), filed by Casie Meyer. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Memorial Hospital at Gulfport Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hospital at Gulfport Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casie Meyer
Represented By: William A. Graves
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?