Casey v. Middlebrooks
Plaintiff: Kendrick Lamont Casey
Defendant: Scott Middlebrooks
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00718
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a written response showing cause why case should not be dismissed... see order. Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/2/19 (PKS)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Kendrick Lamont Casey, re: #3 Order. (PKS)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: On or before November 15, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee... see order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/16/19 (PKS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendrick Lamont Casey (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kendrick Lamont Casey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey v. Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Lamont Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Middlebrooks
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?