Baker v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Plaintiff: Darryl Orrin Baker
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00789
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Attorneys and Pro Se party are advised to include the case number and new judge assignment of 1:19cv789 KS-RHW on future filed pleadings. (JCH)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Keith Starrett for all further proceedings. District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/11/19. (JCH)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Motion Under Rule 9(b) ; denying #4 Motion Under Rule 8(a)(2) ; denying #6 Motion for Leave to File; denying #2 Motion for Leave to File Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 12/11/2019 (wld)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darryl Orrin Baker (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Memos, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(wld)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Darryl Orrin Baker (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(wld)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (DeLashment, W.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Under Rule 8(a)(2) by Darryl Orrin Baker (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Under Rule 9(B), by Darryl Orrin Baker (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (A First Amended Complaint has not been filed), by Darryl Orrin Baker (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643011788), filed by Darryl Orrin Baker (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Orrin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?