Ford v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bieonka Sophia Ford
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00875
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Exclude MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Croft, Marcy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Exclude , MOTION for Order to Show Cause by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Listing of 223 BELO Plaintiffs Subject to the Instant Motion, #2 Exhibit B-Part 1-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #3 Exhibit B-Part 2-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #4 Exhibit B-Part 3-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #5 Exhibit B-Part 4-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #6 Exhibit C-Deposition of James B. Martin, M.D., #7 Exhibit D-Good Faith Correspondence to Howard Nations, #8 Exhibit E-Exemplar Forms Produced by Plaintiffs Lamarice and Katrina Kreeger, #9 Exhibit F-Deposition of Rick D. Hoover, D.O., #10 Exhibit G-Deposition of Eva Hvingelby, #11 Exhibit H-Deposition of Wendy Brunet, #12 Exhibit I-Rick Hoover, D.O. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena, #13 Exhibit J-James Martin, M.D. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena)(Croft, Marcy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy B. Croft on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Croft, Marcy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion by Defendants BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for these Defendants and terminated from the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/2/19 (HM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Rush, Clare)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10464. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/12/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER -- IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than October 2, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/5/2019.(clw) (NEF: Sect J) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7646450) filed by Bieonka Sophia Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Bieonka Sophia Ford(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bieonka Sophia Ford
Represented By: Howard L. Nations - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Marcy B. Croft
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Marcy B. Croft
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?