Monaghan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ryan Monaghan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00895
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and new judge assignment of 1:19cv895 MTP on future filed pleadings. (JCH)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE UPON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker for all further proceedings. District Judge Halil S. Ozerden no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 1/13/20. (JCH)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (JCH)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Monaghan. (JCH)
January 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 8 - # 10. Attorney is advised that when filing summons returns, it should be the original summons stamped "return" by the clerk, not a copy of the summons issued and scanned in on the docket as #4 . Attorney is not required to re-file, but should follow this procedure in future filings. (JCH)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Ryan Monaghan. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavit of Service AG)(Palmer - PHV, Melissa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Ryan Monaghan. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavit of Service OGC)(Palmer - PHV, Melissa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Ryan Monaghan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/9/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavit of Service USAO)(Palmer - PHV, Melissa)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Melissa Palmer is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 2, 2020 (KPM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Melissa Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Monaghan (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Varnado, Mager)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The resident attorney did not sign the application certifying that he agrees to the association with the applicant in this matter. The application may be refiled. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 26, 2019. (js)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Melissa Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4166235) by Ryan Monaghan (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Varnado, Mager)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 18, 2019 (KPM)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JCH)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 12/4/19. (JCH)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Monaghan (RLW)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ryan Monaghan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appeals Council Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monaghan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Monaghan
Represented By: Mager A. Varnado, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?