Willard v. Harrison County Sheriff's Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Wade Alan Willard, Jr.
Defendant: Harrison County Sheriff's Dept., D. Wade Bryant, Christopher Ryan Hearn, William Collins and Russell Holliman, Jr.
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00908
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND: Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than January 30, 2020. Failure to timely comply with any order of the Court may result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 1/16/20 (PKS)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Response to Order (signature page) re #8 ORDER TO SIGN re #6 filed by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SIGN re #6 . Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the signature page of the Attachment [Dkt.6,p.5], along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 1/9/2020 (wld)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 1/9/2020 (wld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 (UNSIGNED) ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Wade Alan Willard Jr. regarding information concerning his case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PKS)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/26/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 11/25/2019 (wld)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wade Alan Willard, Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D. Wade Bryant, William Collins, Harrison County Sheriff's Dept., Christopher Ryan Hearn, Russell Holliman, Jr. filed by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willard v. Harrison County Sheriff's Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Wade Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ryan Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Holliman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Alan Willard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?