McCormick v. Krouse et al
Plaintiff: Mason Montrell McCormick
Defendant: Unknown Krouse, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Harrison County Adult Detention Center and Troy Peterson
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00976
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Response to Order re #8 ORDER, filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff Mason Montrell McCormick shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than 2/11/20. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/28/20. (RLW)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Clerk is directed to mail copies of this order to the Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link for MDOC Inmate Accounts, P.O. Box 97538, Pearl, Mississippi 39288. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/27/20. (RLW)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/19/19. (RLW)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/19/19. (RLW)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 (COPY) COMPLAINT against Harrison County Adult Detention Center, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Unknown Krouse, Troy Peterson, filed by Mason Montrell McCormick (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (RLW) Modified on 12/18/2019 to add COPY (RLW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormick v. Krouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Krouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Montrell McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?