Coding Technologies, LLC v. Mississippi Power Company
Plaintiff: Coding Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Mississippi Power Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00994
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Jordan A. Garellek to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mississippi Power Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, John)
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Robin L. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mississippi Power Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, John)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jay Johnson shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the plaintiff Coding Technologies, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 27, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 ATTACHMENT re #7 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4205822) by Coding Technologies, LLC (McDavid, Stephan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Jordana A. Garellek to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4217614) by Mississippi Power Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Robin L. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4217575) by Mississippi Power Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mississippi Power Company (Crawford, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mississippi Power Company (Crawford, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4205822) by Coding Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: A: Certificates of Good Standing (TX, OK, and CO))(McDavid, Stephan)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Coding Technologies, LLC answer due 2/26/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on January 23, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Coding Technologies, LLC (McDavid, Stephan)
January 22, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Mississippi Power Company Answer due date 1/27/20 (RLW)
January 22, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5: Advising attorney that this entry should have reflected who this summons was served on, and the answer due date should have been set. Attorney is not required to refile. (RLW)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coding Technologies, LLC. (McDavid, Stephan)
January 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile with the first page of the summons with RETURN on it. The #2 Summons docketed as Summons Issued should not have been printed and docketed with the Proof of Service. Document #4 should be disregarded. (RLW)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coding Technologies, LLC. Mississippi Power Company served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (McDavid, Stephan) Modified on 1/14/2020 (RLW).
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, with docket sheet and complaint attached, to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 re #1 Complaint (RLW)
December 30, 2019 Remark: Issued Summons for service mailed to attorney to address on summons via regular us mail. (RLW)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mississippi Power Company. (RLW)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mississippi Power Company (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4171004), filed by Coding Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '008 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coding Technologies, LLC v. Mississippi Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coding Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Power Company
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?