ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. v. Ocean Lion Shipping, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc.
Defendant: Ocean Lion Shipping, Ltd. and Devote Management Pre, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00996
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Bland; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mallory G. Wynne; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel S. Bland. David S. Bland, Mallory G. Wynne and Rachel S. Bland are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/6/2020 (AB)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Rachel S. Bland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4173142) by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment R. Bland's Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Mallory G. Wynne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4173137) by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment M. Wynne's Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for David S. Bland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4173134) by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment D. Bland's Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Colon, Allison)
December 31, 2019 Remark: Original summonses for service mailed to attorney to address on summons via regular us mail. (RLW)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Devote Management Pre, Ltd., Ocean Lion Shipping, Ltd. (RLW)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Devote Management Pre, Ltd., Ocean Lion Shipping, Ltd. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4171070), filed by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - STHM WO 001 Signature, #2 Exhibit B - Signed WO, #3 Exhibit C - Invoice Number V1050003, #4 Exhibit D - Email - 9/27/19 - Subject - V105 Invoices - Lewek Exp, #5 Exhibit E - Final Invoice V1050003R4, #6 Exhibit F - 10/3/19 - Subject - Arrangements for Lewek Expre, #7 Exhibit G - Terms and Conditions, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. v. Ocean Lion Shipping, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Lion Shipping, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devote Management Pre, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Raquel Colon
Represented By: David S. Bland - PHV
Represented By: Mallory G. Wynne - PHV
Represented By: Rachel Bland- PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?