Paramore v. Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rex Paramore
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10, Chemours Company and Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00075
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Luckett, William)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Rex Paramore (Duck, Ashley)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosure by Chemours Company (Ziffer, Lee)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 4/20/2020. Proposed Protective Order due on or before 5/7/2020. Jury Trial set for a three week trial calendar beginning on 8/2/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20-22/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Discovery due by 11/6/2020. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2020. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2020. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 7/6/2020. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 8/6/2020. Motions due by 11/20/2020. Settlement Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 672 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. ADR Report due by 7/13/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2021. EDT: 4-5 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/6/2020 (AB)
April 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2020. PARTICIPANTS: Ashley Hendricks Duck (counsel for Plaintiff); William O. Luckett, Jr. and Jeffrey A. Land - PHV (counsel for Defendant Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.); Lee Blanton Ziffer (counsel for Defendant Chemours Company). A Case Management Order will be entered. (AB)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Land - PHV, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Land - PHV, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
March 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5. Counsel should have selected the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" which can be found under "Other Answers". Counsel does not need to refile. (wld)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Chemours Company.(Ziffer, Lee)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Land. Jeffrey A. Land is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/4/2020 (AB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Jeffrey A. Land to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4221616) by Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Tennessee, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Colorado)(Luckett, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Luckett, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemours Company identifying Other Affiliate Fidelity Management & Research Company for Chemours Company. (Ziffer, Lee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemours Company from Harrison County Circuit Court - First Judicial District, case number A2401-20-45. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4217685) Lower court jury demand. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court papers, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paramore v. Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Paramore
Represented By: Ashley Hendricks Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Land - PHV
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?