Lizana v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chase Rogers Lizana
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00077
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company, and by Chase Rogers Lizana (Nicks, Shantrell)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier are terminated as counsel of record for Defendants. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/20/20 (HM)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Millette on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Millette, Clare)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 Letter sent to Hodges, Lucier, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler and Nations on 3/4/2020, requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (wld)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12192. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2020. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/28/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Chase Rogers Lizana Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) Modified text/filers on 2/26/2020 (clw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/28/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than 1/3/2020, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/4/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/5/2019) (sa). Modified on 12/5/2019 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/28/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/28/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/28/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/28/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7809726) filed by Chase Rogers Lizana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Chase Rogers Lizana(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lizana v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Rogers Lizana
Represented By: Howard L. Nations - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?