Woods v. Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Melissa L. Woods
Defendant: Ben O'Gwin, Darrell Hughes, Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department, Ricky Adam, Shondy Garcia and Taylor Reed
Case Number: 1:2020cv00080
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ricky Adam. (wld)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 REDACTED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ricky Adam, Shondy Garcia, Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department, Darrell Hughes, Ben O'Gwin, Taylor Reed, filed by Melissa L. Woods.(wld)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER regarding the Sealed Complaint. Plaintiff's Counsel has indicated a need for a copy of the Complaint #1 which has been sealed #3 . The Clerk of Court is directed to provide a copy of the Complaint #1 to Plaintiff's Counsel. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/9/2020 (AG)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Clerk of Court is directed to seal the Complaint (ECF No. 1). Plaintiff directed to file a redacted version of the Complaint that complies with Rule 5.2(a) within seven days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/4/2020 (wld)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department, Darrell Hughes, Ben O'Gwin, Taylor Reed. (JCH)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ricky Adam, Shondy Garcia, Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department, Darrell Hughes, Ben O'Gwin, Taylor Reed (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 14643012128), filed by Melissa L. Woods. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa L. Woods
Represented By: Stanley K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben O'Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shondy Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?