Lancaster v. City of Biloxi et al
Plaintiff: Sean Lancaster
Defendant: Patrick J. Gotte, John Miller and City of Biloxi
Case Number: 1:2020cv00095
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Voluntary Disclosure by City of Biloxi (Ros, J.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 16, 2020 (King, Steve)
April 15, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11, 12 and 13. Incorrect event code selected. Counsel should have selected the event code "Summons Returned Executed" which can be found under "Service of Process" and sets the answer deadline. As the defendants have already answered, counsel is not required to refile but should use the correct event code in the future. (wld)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on CITY OF BILOXI on 3/5/20, filed by Sean Lancaster. (Burns, Yancy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on JOHN C. MILLER, CHIEF OF POLICE on 3/5/20, filed by Sean Lancaster. (Burns, Yancy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on PATRICK J. GOTTE on 3/5/20, filed by Sean Lancaster. (Burns, Yancy)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Patrick J. Gotte.(Gunn, Corban)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by City of Biloxi.(Ros, J.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by John Miller.(Simpson, Stephen)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Corban Gunn on behalf of Patrick J. Gotte (Gunn, Corban)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Defenses. City of Biloxi answer due 4/16/2020; Patrick J. Gotte answer due 4/16/2020; John Miller answer due 4/16/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 24, 2020 (King, Steve)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance-CORRECTED AS TO PARTY by John Miller (Simpson, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 (DISREGARD)NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B. Simpson on behalf of City of Biloxi (Simpson, Stephen) Modified on 3/23/2020 (wld).
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Defenses by City of Biloxi, Patrick J. Gotte, John Miller (Ros, J.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Biloxi, Patrick J. Gotte, John Miller. (JCH)
March 3, 2020 Summons mailed to attorney to P.O. Box listed on docket. (JCH)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Biloxi, Patrick J. Gotte, John Miller (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4221709), filed by Sean Lancaster. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster v. City of Biloxi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Gotte
Represented By: Corban Gunn
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Miller
Represented By: Stephen B. Simpson
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Biloxi
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Lancaster
Represented By: Yancy B. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?