Hart v. Salinas et al
Plaintiff: Norman K. Hart
Defendant: Agustin T. Salinas and Mockingbird Transport, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00112
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Mockingbird Transport, LLC, Agustin T. Salinas. (RLW)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman K. Hart. (Brown, Toby)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman K. Hart. Mockingbird Transport, LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Brown, Toby)
May 15, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 4 and # 5. Attorney is advised that both of these summons returns were filed using the incorrect event. Attorney should re-file both documents, using the event "Summons Return Executed", which can be found under the Service of Process category. These documents will be disregarded on the docket. (JCH)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 **DISREGARD**AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on Agustin T. Salinas, filed by Norman K. Hart. (Brown, Toby) Modified on 5/15/2020 (JCH).
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 **DISREGARD**AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on Mockingbird Transport, LLC on April 16, 2020, filed by Norman K. Hart. (Brown, Toby) Modified on 5/15/2020 (JCH).
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Wirtes, Jr on behalf of Norman K. Hart (Wirtes, David)
March 25, 2020 Remark: Summonses emailed to attorney for service (RLW)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mockingbird Transport, LLC, Agustin T. Salinas. (RLW)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Mockingbird Transport, LLC, Agustin T. Salinas (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4239331), filed by Norman K. Hart (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Salinas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman K. Hart
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Represented By: Toby D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin T. Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mockingbird Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?