Batson v. Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC
Plaintiff: Tracey Batson
Defendant: Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00192
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Attorneys are advised to use the new judge assignment of 1:20cv192 LG-RPM on future filings. (JCH)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/3/20. (JCH)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC answer due 8/10/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/24/2020 (SR)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC (Jones, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Pedigo on behalf of Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC (Pedigo, Scott)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC answer due 7/27/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 10, 2020 (King, Steve)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC (Jones, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracey Batson. Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Heilman, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Petition for Preliminary Injunction against Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC, filed by Tracey Batson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Email Communications, #4 Exhibit D - Non-Renewal Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Termination Letter)(Heilman, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring plaintiff to amend or supplement complaint by 6/25/2020 to properly plead diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 11, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 10, 2020 Remark: Original summons for service and return were email to attorney. (RLW)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC (RLW)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4293906), filed by Tracey Batson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Email Communications, #4 Exhibit D - Non-Renewal Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Termination Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batson v. Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Batson
Represented By: Michael A. Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?