Simmons et al v. Silver Slipper Casino Venture, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Vandell Simmons and Teamberya Simmons
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company and Silver Slipper Casino Venture, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00262
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Silver Slipper Casino Venture, L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company. (RLW)
September 25, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6: (1) Attorney's office was previously advised to select individual defendant's names and not All Defendants; (2) To prevent from duplicating the title in the docket entry, only "Second" should have been added; and (3) It is not necessary to include the service information at the end of the Amended Complaint, because attorney is responsible for service. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Teamberya Simmons, Vandell Simmons.(Vega, Denis)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to file, on or before September 29, 2020, a stand-alone amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/15/2020 (AG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Teamberya Simmons, Vandell Simmons.(Vega, Denis)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring briefing on subject matter jurisdiction. On or before September 14, 2020, Plaintiffs must file a response to this Order or an amended complaint addressing this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/18/2020 (AG)
August 17, 2020 Remark: Original summonses for service and return were mailed to attorney in SASE provided by attorney. (RLW)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Silver Slipper Casino Venture, L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company. (RLW)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Silver Slipper Casino Venture, L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643012548), filed by Teamberya Simmons, Vandell Simmons (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons et al v. Silver Slipper Casino Venture, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Slipper Casino Venture, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vandell Simmons
Represented By: Denis E. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamberya Simmons
Represented By: Denis E. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?