Bruen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sandra D. Bruen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00278
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and new judge assignment of 1:20cv278 LRA on future filed pleadings. (JCH)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE UPON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson for all further proceedings. District Judge Halil S. Ozerden no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 10/16/20. (JCH)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (wld)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sandra D. Bruen. (wld)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sandra D. Bruen. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Thomas, Ashley)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sandra D. Bruen. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; (Thomas, Ashley)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sandra D. Bruen. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (Thomas, Ashley)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/26/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
August 25, 2020 Issued summons mailed to attorney to the address listed on the docket and summons. (PKS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PKS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4355521) filed by Sandra D. Bruen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra D. Bruen
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?