Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. v. Parish Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Defendant: Mark A. Parish and Parish Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00303
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendants Mark A. Parish and Parish Corporation. (ASJ)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Mark A. Parish by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James H. Bolin)(Bolin, James)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Parish Corporation by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James H. Bolin)(Bolin, James)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. Mark A. Parish served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bolin, James)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. Parish Corporation served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bolin, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ashtead Holdings, LLC for Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Bolin, James)
September 24, 2020 Issued summons mailed to Plaintiff's counsel to address listed on docket/summons. (JCH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mark A. Parish, Parish Corporation. (JCH)
September 24, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney is advised that the Corporate Disclosure Statement that is attached to the new shell case should be filed by the attorney on ECF once the case has been opened in the system, not submitted as an attachment to a new case. (JCH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark A. Parish, Parish Corporation (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4379661), filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Open Account Terms, #3 Exhibit C - Rental Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit D - Invoices, #5 Exhibit E - Lien, #6 Exhibit F - Account Summary, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. v. Parish Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?