Taylor v. Harrison County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Brian Taylor
Defendant: Harrison County, Mississippi, Harrison County Tax Assessor, Paula Ladner and Paula Ladner
Case Number: 1:2020cv00319
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Harrison County Tax Assessor, Paula Ladner, Harrison County, Mississippi, Paula Ladner.(Holleman, Tim)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 #7 Motions. The deadline for all defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 11/18/20. No further written Order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/9/20 (HM) Modified on 11/10/2020 to add additional verbiage (RLW).
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Harrison County, Mississippi (Holleman, Tim)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Harrison County Tax Assessor, Paula Ladner, Paula Ladner (Holleman, Tim)
October 16, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5: The date defendant was served should have been included on the proof of service page. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Taylor. Paula Ladner served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Zorn, Stacie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Taylor. Harrison County Tax Assessor, Paula Ladner served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Zorn, Stacie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Taylor. Harrison County, Mississippi served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Zorn, Stacie)
October 8, 2020 Summons issued and emailed to Heidelberg, Steinberger firm at email address provided. (wld)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Harrison County Tax Assessor, Paula Ladner, Harrison County, Mississippi, Paula Ladner. (wld)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Harrison County Tax Assessor, Paula Ladner, Harrison County, Mississippi, Paula Ladner ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4390433), filed by Brian Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Harrison County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County, Mississippi
Represented By: Tim C. Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Tax Assessor, Paula Ladner
Represented By: Tim C. Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Ladner
Represented By: Tim C. Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Taylor
Represented By: Stacie Elizabeth Zorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?