Ryan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co.
Plaintiff: Tiffany F. Ryan
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00334
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT: This matter has settled and is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 12/1/20. (RLW)
November 30, 2020 NOTICE of Settlement by All Parties per email notification on 11/30/2020. Ready for District Judge's standard closing order. (AB)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Time. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 12/17/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/17/2020 (AG)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. (Mullen, Harry)
November 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 3. Attorney is advised that based on the Proof of Service attached, the defendant was served on 11/4/20, not 11/2/20. Clerk's Office has modified the entry and the answer due date to reflect the correct answer deadline and service date. (JCH)
November 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. answer due 11/25/2020. (JCH)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany F. Ryan. State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. served on 11/5/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Gunn, Corban) Modified to correct service date and answer due date on 11/10/2020 (JCH).
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. (RLW)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643012737), filed by Tiffany F. Ryan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co.
Represented By: Harry Benjamin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany F. Ryan
Represented By: Corban Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?