World Floor Covering Association, Inc. v. Golconda Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: World Floor Covering Association, Inc.
Defendant: Golconda Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00335
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #9. Return of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attorney is directed to refile using AO form 440 and may attach Doc. #9 as an exhibit with a description. (wld)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by World Floor Covering Association, Inc. as to Golconda Holdings, LLC. (Stone, Adam)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Golconda Holdings, LLC (Ash, David)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Golconda Holdings, LLC (Ash, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Secretary of State in regards to service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JCH)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by World Floor Covering Association, Inc.. Golconda Holdings, LLC served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Stone, Adam)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Golconda Holdings, LLC. (RLW)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by World Floor Covering Association, Inc. as to Golconda Holdings, LLC. (Stone, Adam)
November 16, 2020 Issued summons emailed to attorney. (JCH)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Golconda Holdings, LLC. (JCH)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golconda Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4406543), filed by World Floor Covering Association, Inc. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Venture Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Patent License Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Floor Covering Association, Inc. v. Golconda Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Floor Covering Association, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golconda Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David T. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?