Carter v. Harrison County Adult Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Anthony A. Carter
Defendant: Harrison County Adult Detention Center, Trenton Freeman, Unknown Amos, Unknown Cheskevick and Unknown Willcock
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00362
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Taylor B McNeel
2 Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Submit by Anthony A. Carter (Attachments: #1 Handwritten copy of Response from Grievance Officer, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony A. Carter: Central MS Correctional Facility 3794 Hwy 468, B-Building, C-Zone, Bed 42, Pearl, MS 39208 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Clerk is directed to mail copies of this Order to the plaintiff; and the Warden or Authorized Officer of Inmate Accounts, Harrison County Detention Center, 10451 Larkin Smith Dr., Gulfport, MS 39503. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 1/8/21. (RLW)
December 18, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and new judge assignment of 1:20cv362 TBM-RPM on future filed pleadings. (RLW)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Taylor B. McNeel for all further proceedings. District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/18/20. (RLW)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief Order, by Anthony A. Carter (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Anthony A. Carter (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/7/20. (JCH)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony A. Carter (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Amos, Unknown Cheskevick, Trenton Freeman, Harrison County Adult Detention Center, Unknown Willcock, filed by Anthony A. Carter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and A1 - Incident Reports, #2 Exhibit 1 and 1-2 - Grievance Forms, #3 Envelope, #4 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Harrison County Adult Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cheskevick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Willcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony A. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?