Myers v. Gulf States Trampoline, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carly Myers
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-10, Fun Spot America of Atlanta, Inc., Fun Spot Manufacturing, LLC, ATP Franchising, LLC and Gulf States Trampoline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00372
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Taylor B McNeel
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 12. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are TBM-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Rule 4 Summons Executed as to Defendant, Gulf States Trampoline, LLC by Carly Myers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Summons-Gulf States Trampoline, LLC)(Tynes, Douglas)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carly Myers. Gulf States Trampoline, LLC served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Tynes, Douglas)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ATP Franchising, LLC (Williams, Matthew)
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fun Spot Manufacturing, LLC (Dukes, Walter)
December 22, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 5. Attorney is advised that this document should have been filed as State Court Record, which can be found under the "Other Documents" category. Also, all exhibits should be labeled with an exhibit letter/number. Attorney is advised that in the future, state court record can be scanned in as one document. This document does not need to be re-filed. (JCH)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Gulf States Trampoline, LLC. (RLW)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gulf States Trampoline, LLC (Williams, Matthew)
December 21, 2020 Attorneys are advised to use the case number and new judge assignment of 1:20cv372 TBM-JCG on future filed pleadings. (RLW)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Taylor B. McNeel for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 12/21/20 (RLW)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record by Gulf States Trampoline, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to ATP Franchising, LLC, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to Gulf States Trampoline, LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to Fun Spot Manufacturing, LLC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons to America of Atlanta, Inc., #6 Exhibit 6 - Circuit Court Receipt, #7 Exhibit 7 - POS to ATP Franchising, LLC, #8 Exhibit 8 - POS to Fun Spot Manufacturing, LLC, #9 Exhibit 9 - POS to Fun Spot of America of Atlanta, #10 Exhibit 10 - Stipulation and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Fun Sport America of Atlanta, Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - Order of Dismissal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Filing of Removal)(Williams, Matthew)
December 18, 2020 Counsel should use the newly assigned Judge's initials on future filings. 1:20cv372LG-JCG. (wld)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Halil S. Ozerden recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 12/18/20. (RLW)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Fun Spot Manufacturing, LLC (Dukes, Walter)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Gulf States Trampoline, LLC (Williams, Matthew)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gulf States Trampoline, LLC from Circuit Court of Harrison Co., MS, 1st Jud. Dist., case number A2401-2020-498, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 14643012850) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Attorneys Involved, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Gulf States Trampoline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fun Spot America of Atlanta, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fun Spot Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Walter W. Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATP Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf States Trampoline, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Moran Young
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carly Myers
Represented By: Douglas L. Tynes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?