Toomer v. Jackson County ADC/Jail et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Carl Toomer
Defendant: Jackson County ADC/Jail and State of Mississippi
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00381
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Appealability Denied. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 2/18/21. (JCH)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT: Ordered that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 2/18/21. (JCH)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Ordered that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 2/18/21. (JCH)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 Response to Order re #5 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND filed by Jesse Carl Toomer. (Attachments: #1 - Copy of Mail Room log, #2 Envelope)(JCH)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #5 Order. Mail sent to Jesse Carl Toomer (JCH)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Jesse Carl Toomer. (JCH)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 Change of Address filed by Jesse Carl Toomer (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND: Ordered that Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this order no later than February 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/19/21. (JCH)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/19/21. (JCH)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Mail returned as undeliverable. Mail sent to Jesse Carl Toomer containing Notice of Assignment and NEF of docs #1 and #2 . (JCH)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Carl Toomer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jesse Carl Toomer. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toomer v. Jackson County ADC/Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Carl Toomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County ADC/Jail
Represented By: Lynn Fitch-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Lynn Fitch-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?