Braddock v. Dodson
Plaintiff: Patrick Aaron Braddock
Defendant: F. Dodson
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv00055
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 filed by Patrick Aaron Braddock. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/12/2021 (wld)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Parties should use the newly assigned Judge's initials on future filings. 1:21cv55HSO-RPM. (wld)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/3/21. (JCH)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Patrick Aaron Braddock (Attachments: #1 - Account Information, #2 Envelope)(JCH)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F. Dodson, filed by Patrick Aaron Braddock. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braddock v. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Aaron Braddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?