Cooley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David L. Cooley, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00078
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER establishing schedule and requirements for briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on April 5, 2021. (JC)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by David L. Cooley, Jr. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/26/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (JCH)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JCH)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 14643013108), filed by David L. Cooley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Assignment)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Cooley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?