Affordable Care, LLC v. McIntyre et al
Plaintiff: Affordable Care, LLC
Defendant: Raeline K. McIntyre, DMD, P.C. and Raeline K. McIntyre
Case Number: 1:2021cv00085
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on April 19, 2021 (King, Steve)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Caroline J. Sanches to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4532938) by Affordable Care, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Mayberry, Meredith)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for David A. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4532926) by Affordable Care, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Mayberry, Meredith)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Nancy A. Cundiff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4532910) by Affordable Care, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Mayberry, Meredith)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Affordable Care, LLC. Raeline K. McIntyre waiver sent on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Mayberry, Meredith)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Affordable Care, LLC. Raeline K. McIntyre, DMD, P.C. waiver sent on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Mayberry, Meredith)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affordable Care, LLC (Mayberry, Meredith)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Raeline K. McIntyre, Raeline K. McIntyre, DMD, P.C.. (JCH)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raeline K. McIntyre, Raeline K. McIntyre, DMD, P.C. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0538-4513708), filed by Affordable Care, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit C - General Arbitrator Oath Form, #4 Exhibit D - Response to Claimant's Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
March 24, 2021 Issued summons mailed to attorney, Meredith Mayberry, to New Orleans address listed on docket/summons. (JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Care, LLC v. McIntyre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raeline K. McIntyre, DMD, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raeline K. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Care, LLC
Represented By: Meredith A. Mayberry
Represented By: Nancy A. Cundiff - PHV
Represented By: Caroline J. Sanches - PHV
Represented By: David A. Campbell - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?