Waggoner et al v. Shoemaker et al
Plaintiff: John W. Waggoner and Kathryn K. Waggoner
Defendant: Ruth M. Shoemaker and Larry Shoemaker
Case Number: 1:2021cv00101
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Plead Fraud Properly Under Rule 9(b) filed by Ruth M. Shoemaker (Leggett, Joshua)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Plead Fraud Properly Under Rule 9(b) by Ruth M. Shoemaker (Leggett, Joshua)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on April 21, 2021 (King, Steve)
April 21, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4. Counsel did not include the case number or the date the waiver was sent on the document. Counsel should make these corrections on future filings. Counsel is not required to refile. (wld)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kathryn K. Waggoner, John W. Waggoner. Larry Shoemaker waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Ruth M. Shoemaker waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Stevens, Scott)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Richard E. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4534864) by John W. Waggoner, Kathryn K. Waggoner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Other Courts Admitted to Practice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stevens, Scott)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Larry Shoemaker, Ruth M. Shoemaker. (JCH)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry Shoemaker, Ruth M. Shoemaker (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0538-4521459), filed by Kathryn K. Waggoner, John W. Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Membership Interest Purchase Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
April 1, 2021 Issued summons mailed to attorney to address listed on docket/summons. (JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waggoner et al v. Shoemaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Waggoner
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Represented By: Richard E. Davis - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn K. Waggoner
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Represented By: Richard E. Davis - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth M. Shoemaker
Represented By: Joshua A. Leggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?