Hickman v. City of Wiggins
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hickman
Defendant: City of Wiggins
Case Number: 1:2021cv00118
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Wiggins (Butler, Gregory)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Marsh on behalf of City of Wiggins (Marsh, Jason)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jeremy Hickman as to City of Wiggins. (Bowden, Benjamin)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeremy Hickman. City of Wiggins waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Bowden, Benjamin)
April 21, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 3. Summons were already issued in this case on 4/8/21. A return on summons, either executed or unexecuted, should have been filed prior to a Waiver of Service of Summons being filed/executed. (JCH)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Wiggins. (RLW)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against City of Wiggins (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0538-4525696), filed by Jeremy Hickman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)
April 8, 2021 Remark: Original issued summonses for service and return were emailed to attorney. (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickman v. City of Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hickman
Represented By: Benjamin U. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Jason T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?