Wilson v. Bay Tower Apartments et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wilson
Defendant: Unknown Other Employees, Melissa Miller, Jean Jolly and Bay Tower Apartments
Case Number: 1:2021cv00138
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/19/2021 (AG)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rebecca Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit B-Money Order Receipts for Rent, #4 Exhibit C-Managers wrongful eviction letter, #5 Exhibit D-Emails between Rebecca and Bay Tower Apt., #6 Exhibit E-Rebecca's 1st complain for unhealthy conditions, #7 Exhibit F-Rebecca's No Eviction Declaration, #8 Exhibit G-Letter left on Rebecca's mother's vehicle, #9 Exhibit H-Notice of 3 day Eviction for nonpayment of rent, #10 Exhibit I-Rebecca's Final Legal Notice, #11 Exhibit J-Rebecca's husband's 4 separate bailbond receipts, #12 Exhibit K-Receipt/Ms. Miller having Rebecca's truck towed, #13 Exhibit L-Kelly Blue Book Value in her losses of truck towed, #14 Exhibit M-Document of the value of the Townie Electric bike, #15 Exhibit N-Receipt & serial #s of missing/stolen property, #16 Exhibit O-Affidavits by Witnesses, #17 Exhibit P-Lowes Receipts & invoices of unit repairs, #18 Exhibit Q-Medical diagnosis and Birthing Complications, #19 Cover Letter, #20 Envelope)(wld)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Se Consent and Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Rebecca Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (wld)
May 10, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5. There was no exhibit marked as exhibit R and S as listed on exhibit list. (wld)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before June 1, 2021, Plaintiff may complete form AO 239, the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/3/2021 (AG)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Rebecca Wilson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Bay Tower Apartments, Jean Jolly, Melissa Miller, Unknown Other Employees, filed by Rebecca Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Notice to Landlord, #3 Envelope, #4 Notice of Assignment) (Exhibits were not attached to Complaint) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Bay Tower Apartments et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Other Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Tower Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?