RPM Pizza, LLC v. Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. et al
Defendant: Steven Molina, Robert Kitchens, Jr. and Risk Services, LLC
Counter Defendant: RPM Pizza, LLC
Counter Claimant: Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. and Applied Risk Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00158
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
2 Judge: Bradley W Rath
3 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to all parties with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 1/18/2023 (PKS)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #92: Docket entry modified by court staff to add Second in front of Amended Complaint. (RLW)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Settlement by All Parties per email notification on 1/17/2023. Ready for the District Judge's standard closing order dismissing the matter with prejudice. (AB)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Hearing terminated. In light of the Notice of Settlement entered this date, the TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 1/19/2023 before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath is hereby CANCELLED. (AB)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., filed by RPM Pizza, LLC. (Bailey, Simon) Modified on 1/17/2023 to add Second (RLW).
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by RPM Pizza, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Second Amended Complaint)(Bailey, Simon)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 90. Attorney is advised that the proper division that should be listed on all future filings is "Southern Division", not Gulfport Division. (JCH)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's #91 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Given the unopposed nature of the Motion, Plaintiff is granted leave to file the [91-1] Second Amended Complaint and is to do so promptly. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 1/13/2023 (TS)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Applied Risk Solutions by RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference regarding status of settlement set for 1/19/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath. Counsel for Plaintiff will place the call to Judge Rath's Chambers (228-563-1755) with all necessary counsel on the line. (AB)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath: Settlement Conference held on 12/13/2022. PARTICIPANTS: Joe Sam Owen, Simon T. Bailey, and Stephen Lee Thomas (counsel for Plaintiff); Glenn Mueller (representative for Plaintiff); Charles Greg Copeland and Christopher W. Martin - PHV (counsel for Defense); Bobby Kitchen (Defendant); Steven Molina (Defendant); Bobby Kitchen and Steven Molina (representatives for Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., and Applied Risk Solutions, LLC); and Allison Volkov. The matter settled at the conference. Subject to finalization of the settlement documents and consummation of the settlement by the parties, the matter will be ready for the District Judge's standard closing order dismissing the matter with prejudice with the parties to bear their own costs. Tape Number: 12/13/2022 (RESTRICTED). (AB)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #86: Advising attorney that Motion for Partial Summary Judgment should have also been included in the title of the document. Attorney is not required to re-file; and DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #87 and #89: Incorrect linkage made. Memorandum in Support should be linked to the appropriate motion. Document #87 should have been linked to #82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Motion for Summary Judgment, and #89 should have been linked to #83 Motion to Strike. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (RLW)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #88 Response in Opposition to Motion, #83 Motion to Strike, filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon) Modified on 10/7/2022 to create relationship to document #83 (RLW).
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION to Strike RPM Pizza, LLC's Testifying Expert, Hayden Burrus filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Burrus Report, #2 Exhibit 2. Feasibility Study, #3 Exhibit 3. RIC Deposition, #4 Exhibit 4. 12/2/16 Email, #5 Exhibit 5. Cox Deposition, #6 Exhibit 6. Mueller Deposition, #7 Exhibit 7. Paweski Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8. 1/13/14 Agent of Record Exclusivity Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9. 9/28/18 Email, #10 Exhibit 10. ARS Deposition, #11 Exhibit 11. 9/18/19 Email, #12 Exhibit 12. Molina Deposition, #13 Exhibit 13. 5/28/19 Letter)(Bailey, Simon)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #86 Response in Opposition to Motion, #82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon) Modified on 10/7/2022 to create relationship to document #82 (RLW).
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and Defendant Applied Risk Solutions MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. RIC Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2. ARS Deposition, #3 Exhibit 3. Agent of Record Exclusivity Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4. Kitchen Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5. Molina Deposition, #6 Exhibit 6. 12/2/16 Email, #7 Exhibit 7. Cox Deposition, #8 Exhibit 8. 12/2/16 Email, #9 Exhibit 9. 12/5/17 Email, #10 Exhibit 10. Mueller Deposition, #11 Exhibit 11. 10/17/18 Letter, #12 Exhibit 12. 10/7/18 Email, #13 Exhibit 13. 12/8/17 Email, #14 Exhibit 14. 11/1/16 Email, #15 Exhibit 15. 11/30/16 Email, #16 Exhibit 16. 11/30/16 Email, #17 Exhibit 17. Sample Certificate, #18 Exhibit 18. 9/14/18 Email and attachment, #19 Exhibit 19. Paweski Declaration, #20 Exhibit 20. 8/14/18 Email, #21 Exhibit 21. 9/21/18 Email, #22 Exhibit 22. 9/26/18 Email, #23 Exhibit 23. 10/1/18 Email, #24 Exhibit 24. 10/17/18, #25 Exhibit 25. 10/17/18 Email, #26 Exhibit 26. 12/6/18 Email, #27 Exhibit 27. 3/29/19 Email, #28 Exhibit 28. 4/11/19 Email, #29 Exhibit 29. 4/17/19 Email, #30 Exhibit 30. 4/19/19 Email, #31 Exhibit 31. 5/28/19 Letter, #32 Exhibit 32. 9/28/118 Email, #33 Exhibit 33. 11/30/18 Email, #34 Exhibit 34. 10/1/18 Email, #35 Exhibit 35. 11/5/18 Executive Summary, #36 Exhibit 36. 5/22/19 Email, #37 Exhibit 37. 9/18/19 Email, #38 Exhibit 38. Nalley Declaration, #39 Exhibit 39. 9/14/20 Letter, #40 Exhibit 40. 2/2/21 Email, #41 Exhibit 41. 2/4/21 Email, #42 Exhibit 42. 2/9/21 Email, #43 Exhibit 43. Burrus Report) (Bailey, Simon) Modified on 10/7/2022 to remove additional verbiage (RLW).
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #85 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to #82 Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment and #83 Motion to Strike Expert Witness. Responses due 10/5/2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 09/27/2022 (cf)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #84 Memorandum in Support, #82 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendant Applied Risk Solutions Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment, #83 MOTION to Strike RPM Pizza, LLC's Testifying Expert, Hayden Burrus by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #82: This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #82 and #84: (1) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description (Exhibit numbers were not included in the description box). Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings, and (2) Attorney is advised to remove the blue header from previously filed documents used as an exhibit for current filings so that the old and new headers will not overlap. It is not necessary to re-file. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #83 and #84: Defendant Risk Services, LLC was terminated on 7/28/21 and should not have been included as a party/filer in these documents. See first paragraph. (RLW)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #83 MOTION to Strike RPM Pizza, LLC's Testifying Expert, Hayden Burrus filed by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Designation, #2 Exhibit Motion to Strike, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Kenneth Cox)(Lewis - PHV, Mark)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Strike RPM Pizza, LLC's Testifying Expert, Hayden Burrus by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendant Applied Risk Solutions MOTION for Summary Judgment by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Robert Kitchen, Jr., #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Steve Molina, #4 Exhibit Insurance Summary, #5 Exhibit HRRG Shareholder Agreement) (Lewis - PHV, Mark). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 9/15/2022. This Motion is only as to Applied Risk Solutions, LLC (RLW).
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #81: (1) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description (Exhibit number and a brief description should have been included in the description box). Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings; and (2) This docket entry fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (RLW)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Due to reassignment, the Settlement Conference is reset for 12/13/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath. Counsel are instructed to submit to Judge Rath, seven (7) days prior to the conference, a memorandum (3 page maximum in PDF format) setting forth a brief explanation of the case, and a candid appraisal of their respective positions, including possible settlement figures. This document is NOT to be exchanged and will be viewed only by the Court. The settlement memoranda should be sent to Judge Rath via e-mail (rath_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov). LOCAL COUNSEL, LEAD COUNSEL AND PARTIES WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY MUST BE PHYSICALLY PRESENT AT THE CONFERENCE (INCLUDING INSURANCE CARRIERS WHO HAVE AUTHORITY). FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. (AB)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #81 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike Expert Witness. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 09/14/2022 (cf)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Expert Witness by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Lewis - PHV, Mark) Modified on 9/14/2022 to add additional filer (RLW).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #79 and #80: (1) Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Documents #79 and #80 will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file documents. Before filing, attorney should make all necessary changes. Also, the attorney that signed the main document, should also sign the certificate of service; (2) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description (The exhibit number and description must be included in the description box). Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings; (3) Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.); and (4) This docket entry fails to select all filing parties. Risk & Insurance Consultant, Inc. was not selected as a filer. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #80: Incorrect pdf document attached. The actual Motion should have been attached. The Memorandum in Support of Motion that is attached, should be docketed separately using the same event code, which can be found under Responses and Replies, and linked to the Motion. Defendant Risk Services, LLC was terminated on 7/28/21 and should not be included party/filer. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #79: In the first paragraph Applied Risk name is not listed as it is on the docket. (RLW)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. MOTION to Strike RPM Pizza, LLC's Testifying Expert, Hayden Burrus by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Lewis - PHV, Mark) Modified on 9/13/2022 (RLW).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Attachment Proposed Order)(Lewis - PHV, Mark) Modified on 9/13/2022 (RLW).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Initial Disclosure by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hayden Burrus by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE to Take Deposition of RPM Pizza, LLC by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Glenn Mueller by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Cox by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Applied Risk Solutions, LLC by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Molina by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Kitchen Jr. by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Kitchen, Jr. by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Molina by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Applied Risk Solutions, LLC by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE to Take Deposition of R. Wade Vandiver by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Molina by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Kitchen, Jr. by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Applied Risk Solutions, LLC by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/1/2022 (PKS)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Parties should use the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials BWR on future filings. (PKS)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Service of Defendants' Designation of Experts by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Response to Request for Production by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark) Modified on 7/15/2022 to add additional filer (RLW).
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #58: This docket entry fails to select all filing parties, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (RLW)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 7/1/2022 (AB)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2022 re #50 MOTION to Compel filed by RPM Pizza, LLC. PARTICIPANTS: Joe Sam Owen, Simon T. Bailey, and Stephen Lee Thomas (counsel for Plaintiff); Charles Greg Copeland and Mark E. Lewis - PHV (counsel for Defendants). The parties will submit a proposed Order to the Court. (AB)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #50 MOTION to Compel : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. Counsel for Plaintiff will place the call to Judge Walker's Chambers (228-563-1755) with all necessary counsel on the line. (AB)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support re #50 MOTION to Compel filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Compel by RPM Pizza, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Defs. Written Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2. Liquidation Order, #3 Exhibit 3. 5.19.22 Email, #4 Exhibit 4. 5.31.22 Email and Letter Attachment, #5 Exhibit 5. 6.7.22 Email, #6 Exhibit 6. 5.31.22 Email to Liquidator, #7 Exhibit 7. Good Faith Certificate)(Bailey, Simon)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Designation of Expert Witnesses by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon) Modified on 6/17/2022 (RLW).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #48: Incorrect event chosen. This entry will be disregarded. Attorney is advised to re-file using the correct event, Notice of Service of Designation of Experts. The event code is under Discovery Documents. (RLW)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #39,40,41,and 41. Actual discovery requests/responses to discovery requests are not to be filed with the Court [L.U.Civ.R. 5.(d)(3)]. Only a notice of service should be filed with the Court [Official Form No. 2(b)].Also, the correct division should be "Southern Division" instead of Gulfport Division on the heading and the correct Judge initials on the case number is 1:21cv158LG-RHWR. Also, the signing attorney should be the attorney electronically filing the document; however, since Mr. Lewis' block information is included on the document, counsel is not required to refile but should follow this procedure in future filings. (wld)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 First NOTICE of Service of Defendant Risk & Insurance Consultants, INC.'s Objections and Answers to Plaintiff, RPM Pizza, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Response to Interrogatories by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 First NOTICE of Service of Defendant Steven Molina's Objections and Answers to Plaintiff, RPM Pizza, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Response to Interrogatories by Steven Molina (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 First NOTICE of Service of Defendant Robert Kitchens, Jr.'s Objections and Answers to Plaintiff, RPM Pizza, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Productiion of Documents Response to Interrogatories by Robert Kitchens, Jr (Lewis - PHV, Mark)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 First NOTICE of Service of Defendant Applied Risk Solutions, LLC's Objections and Answers to Plaintiff, RPM Pizza, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Response to Interrogatories by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Policy)(Lewis - PHV, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2022 re #36 MOTION to Extend Experts, discovery, motions Deadline filed by RPM Pizza, LLC. PARTICIPANTS: Simon T. Bailey, and Stephen Lee Thomas (counsel for Plaintiff); Charles Greg Copeland (counsel for Defendants Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina, and Applied Risk Solutions, LLC). Orders will follow. (AB)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #36 Motion to Extend Experts, Discovery, Motions Deadlines. An amended case management order will be entered. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 4/12/22 (TS)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for a four week trial calendar beginning on 3/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 2/15-16/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 8/29/2022. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/17/2022. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/18/2022. Motions due by 9/12/2022. Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2022 at 9:30 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. ADR Report due by 2/8/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 4/12/2022 (AB)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #36 MOTION to Extend Experts, discovery, motions Deadline : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. Counsel for Plaintiff will place the call to Judge Walker's Chambers (228-563-1755) with all necessary counsel on the line. (AB)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing as to #36 MOTION to Extend Experts, discovery, motions Deadline. Due to a scheduling conflict with counsel for Defense, the TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing is RESET (TIME CHANGE ONLY) for 4/12/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. Counsel for Plaintiff will place the call to Judge Walker's Chambers (228-563-1755) with all necessary counsel on the line. (AB)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Extend Experts, discovery, motions Deadline by RPM Pizza, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.Email)(Bailey, Simon)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RPM Pizza, LLC.(Bailey, Simon)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Given the unopposed nature of the Motion, Plaintiff is granted leave to file it's first Amended Complaint [34-1] and is to do so promptly. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 2/2/22 (TS)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by RPM Pizza, LLC (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Bailey, Simon)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for a four week trial calendar beginning on 1/3/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14-15/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 6/29/2022. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2022. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2022. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 4/18/2022. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 5/18/2022. Motions due by 7/13/2022. Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 9:30 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. ADR Report due by 12/7/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2022. EDT: 6 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 1/12/2022 (AB)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 1/12/2022. PARTICIPANTS: Joe Sam Owen, Simon T. Bailey, and Stephen Lee Thomas (counsel for Plaintiff); Charles Greg Copeland and Mark E. Lewis - PHV (counsel for Defendants Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina, and Applied Risk Solutions, LLC). A Case Management Order will be entered. (AB)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney Mark E. Lewis be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina, and Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 1/6/2022 (AB)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #32: Advising attorney that if a certificate of service is included, it must also be electronically signed. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Mark E. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4737171) by Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-TX Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2-Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Copeland, Charles)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #31: Attorney is advised to include the correct magistrate judge assignment of RHWR after the case number on future filed pleadings. This case was reassigned to Judge Walker on 10/1/21. (RLW)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: The Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 1/12/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. Counsel will follow all other instructions given in the Rule 16(a) Initial Order #28 . (AB)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. The Telephonic Case Management Conference will be rescheduled after Defendants file the Second Amended Counterclaim and responsive pleadings. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 11/19/2021 (AB)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting #15 MOTION to Dismiss and #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. Defendants are granted leave to file a Second Amended Counterclaim within 14 days of the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. The request to file a restricted Second Amended Complaint is denied. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/8/2021 (PKS)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. (AB)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Movant was voluntarily dismissed per #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/6/2021 (cf)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Bailey, Simon) Modified on 10/4/2021 (CO).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Bailey, Simon)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #26 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. #27 . (CO)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 10/1/2021 (PG)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RHWR on future filings. (PG)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #22 Response to #18 Motion to Dismiss filed by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina, Applied Risk Solutions, LLC (Martin - PHV, Christopher) Modified on 9/28/2021 (wld). Modified on 9/28/2021 (wld). Modified on 9/28/2021 to add filers (wld).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims filed by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina, Applied Risk Solutions, LLC (Martin - PHV, Christopher) Modified on 9/28/2021 (wld). Modified on 9/28/2021 to add filers (wld).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation as to Doc. #22 and #23. These docket entries failed to select all filing parties. Clerks office has edited the docket entries to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. Docket Annotation as to #23: Incomplete linkage made. As previously directed this memorandum should have also been linked to motion #18. All related filings to motions (using the"Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. Counsel does not need to refile. (wld)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc #20 and #21. Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Document #20 and #21 will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file documents. Counsel should also link the memorandum to the related motion when refiling. (wld)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (DISREGARD)MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #20 Response to Motion filed by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (McMichael - PHV, William) Modified on 9/28/2021 (wld).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (DISREGARD)RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims filed by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (McMichael - PHV, William) Modified on 9/28/2021 (wld).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims by RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM for Slander and Tortious Interference against RPM Pizza, LLC by Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina.(Martin - PHV, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney William E. McMichael be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina and Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/3/2021 (AB)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for William E. McMichael to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4621728) by Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 Supreme Court of Texas Certificate)(Copeland, Charles)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 14. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to label all exhibits with a letter/number in future filings. (JCH)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RPM Pizza, LLC (Owen, Joe)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney Christopher W. Martin be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants, Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina and Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/26/2021 (AB)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Christopher W. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4614249) by Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Copeland, Charles)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against RPM Pizza, LLC by Robert Kitchens, Jr, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Steven Molina.(Copeland, Charles)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Defendants Motion to Dismiss #9 raises jurisdictional issues. Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(3)(B), proceedings in this matter, including discovery, are stayed pending ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/16/21 (TS)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Risk Services, LLC (Brabec, William)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Risk Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Declaration in Support)(Brabec, William)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RPM Pizza, LLC. Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Owen, Joe)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RPM Pizza, LLC. Robert Kitchens, Jr served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Owen, Joe)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RPM Pizza, LLC. Steven Molina served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Owen, Joe)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RPM Pizza, LLC. Applied Risk Solutions, LLC served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Owen, Joe)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RPM Pizza, LLC. Risk Services, LLC served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (Owen, Joe)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr., Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Risk Services, LLC (RLW)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of RPM Pizza, LLC (Thomas, Stephen)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Applied Risk Solutions, LLC, Robert Kitchens, Jr, Steven Molina, Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc., Risk Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 0538-4553729) filed by RPM Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RPM Pizza, LLC v. Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Molina
Represented By: Christopher W. Martin - PHV
Represented By: William Edward McMichael - PHV
Represented By: Charles Greg Copeland
Represented By: Mark E. Lewis - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kitchens, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher W. Martin - PHV
Represented By: William Edward McMichael - PHV
Represented By: Charles Greg Copeland
Represented By: Mark E. Lewis - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Services, LLC
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: RPM Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Joe Sam Owen
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W. Martin - PHV
Represented By: William Edward McMichael - PHV
Represented By: Charles Greg Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Applied Risk Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Christopher W. Martin - PHV
Represented By: Charles Greg Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?