United States of America v. One Black Taurus G2C 9MM Caliber Pistol
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Black Taurus G2C 9MM Caliber Pistol
Case Number: 1:2021cv00255
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/8/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Myers' chambers. (SR)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Case such that the Clerk of Court is directed to restrict access to the Court and litigants; granting #3 Motion to Stay Proceedings; granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process. The sealing and stay of case will remain in effect until November 15, 2021, or until such time as the Government moves to unseal and lift stay, whichever comes first. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 8/23/2021 (wld)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Processof Complaint and Notice on Potential Claimants by United States of America (Baldwin-Federal Gov, Clay)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by United States of America (Baldwin-Federal Gov, Clay)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Case by United States of America (Baldwin-Federal Gov, Clay)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One Black Taurus G2C 9MM Caliber Pistol, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of DEA Special Agent Adrien C. Thomas, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Black Taurus G2C 9MM Caliber Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Clay B. Baldwin-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Black Taurus G2C 9MM Caliber Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?