Tiblier v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Delores Ann Tiblier
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00269
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 10/1/21 (MGB)
October 1, 2021 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RHWR on future filings. (MGB)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is hereby denied without prejudice to movant's right to refile when an updated certificate is submitted. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 9/17/2021 (AB)
September 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Riana Maryanoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4658640) by Delores Ann Tiblier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Harris, Terris)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record #9 , filed on behalf of Defendants BP Exploration & Production, Inc., and BP America Production Company ("BP"). Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, and Scott C. Seiler are granted leave to withdraw and terminated from the docket as counsel for BP. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/27/21 (HM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christi G. Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Christi)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Crump, Richard)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company (Tardy, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 Letter sent to Hodges, Lucier, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler, Durkee and Maryanoff on 8/19/2021, requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (wld)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00755. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/16/2021.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8815780) filed by Delores Ann Tiblier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Riana Maryanoff added to party Delores Ann Tiblier(pty:pla).(Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiblier v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Ann Tiblier
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Riana Maryanoff
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Christi G. Jones
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Christi G. Jones
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?