Williams v. Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Charles Williams
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00276
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Charles Williams (Ott, Paul)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company (McRaney, Trace)
October 13, 2021 Reset Hearing: Due to reassignment, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 11/18/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. Counsel for Defense will place the call to Judge Walker's Chambers (228-563-1755) with all necessary counsel on the line. Confidential case memoranda are to be submitted to Judge Walker via email (Walker_Chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov) on or before one week prior to the conference. The CONFIDENTIAL case memoranda are NOT to be exchanged and will be viewed only by the Court. (AB)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 10/1/21 (MGB)
October 1, 2021 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RHWR on future filings. (MGB)
September 27, 2021 Reset Hearing: Due to a conflict with Defense Counsel's schedule, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 11/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Counsel will follow all other instructions given in the Rule 16(a) Initial Order #5 . (AB)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company.(McRaney, Trace)
September 13, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 3. Attorney is advised that when filing a summons return, the original summons issued by the court and stamped "return" is the summons that should be used, not a copy of the issued summons printed off of ECF with the previous filing heading/date. Attorney does not need to re-file, but should follow this procedure in future filings. (JCH)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Williams. Mountain Laurel Assurance Company served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Ott, Paul)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. (RLW)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Mountain Laurel Assurance Company (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 14643013570), filed by Charles Williams (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Williams
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Represented By: Trace D. McRaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?