Brit UW Limited v. D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brit UW Limited
Defendant: D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC and DAS Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00280
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Brit UW Limited by DAS Holdings LLC, D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC.(Chandler, Ann)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on October 12, 2021. (JC)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on October 12, 2021. (JC)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Paul Jeffery Rowe, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4678077) by Brit UW Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from State Bar of Georgia)(Johnson, Whitman)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Richard E. Zelonka, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4678072) by Brit UW Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from State Bar of Georgia, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar)(Johnson, Whitman)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC's answer is due no later than 10/22/2021. DAS Holdings LLC's answer is due no later than 10/22/2021. No further written Order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on September 8, 2021. (JC)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC, DAS Holdings LLC (Chandler, Ann)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Russell Chandler on behalf of D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC, DAS Holdings LLC (Chandler, Ann)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Victor Welsh, III on behalf of D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC, DAS Holdings LLC (Welsh, C.)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Taylor B. McNeel recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Halil S. Ozerden for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 8/27/2021 (wld)
August 27, 2021 Counsel should use the newly assigned Judge's initials on future filings. 1:21cv280-HSO-RPM. (wld)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorraine Walters Boykin on behalf of Brit UW Limited (Boykin, Lorraine)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DAS Holdings LLC. (wld)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC. (wld)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC, DAS Holdings LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 4643888), filed by Brit UW Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2021: #2 Exhibit A-Policy 0118111701, #3 Exhibit B-Policy 0118111702, #4 Exhibit C-June 21, 2021 email correspondence, #5 Exhibit D-Late Reported Claims) (wld).
August 26, 2021 Issued summons mailed to Whitman B. Johnson, III at address on docket and on summons. (wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brit UW Limited v. D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brit UW Limited
Represented By: Whitman B. Johnson, III
Represented By: Lorraine Walters Boykin
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Rowe - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Edward Zelonka - PHV, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.S. Ladner Holdings, LLC
Represented By: C. Victor Welsh, III
Represented By: Ann Russell Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAS Holdings LLC
Represented By: C. Victor Welsh, III
Represented By: Ann Russell Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?