Bagwell v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Edward J. Bagwell, Jr.
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00286
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Edward J. Bagwell, Jr (Oldmixon, Colette)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Edward J. Bagwell, Jr (Oldmixon, Colette)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on October 12, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (JC)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Piazza, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (DeLashmet, W.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (DeLashmet, W.)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a four-week term of Court beginning on 10/31/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19-20/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 5/3/2022. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2021. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2021. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/1/2022. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/1/2022. Motions due by 5/17/2022. Settlement Conference set for 8/2/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 10/12/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2022. EDT: 2-3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 10/6/2021 (SR)
October 6, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/6/2021 with attorneys Colette A. Oldmixon and John Anthony Piazza. (SR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (DeLashmet, W.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 First NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (DeLashmet, W.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anthony Piazza on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Piazza, John)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Edward J. Bagwell, Jr (Oldmixon, Colette)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Party Subpoena - Highland Community Hospital, #2 Exhibit Non-Party Subpoena -Slidell Memorial Hospital, #3 Exhibit Non-Party Subpoena - Mississippi Home Care Picayune, #4 Exhibit Non-Party Subpoena - Elite Orthopedic Specialists, #5 Exhibit Non-Party Subpoena - Picayune Physical Therapy Center, #6 Exhibit Non-Party Subpoena - Ochsner Medical Center - Northshore, #7 Exhibit Non-Party Subpoena - Dr. Pedro Serrant)(DeLashmet, W.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (DeLashmet, W.)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Circuit Court of Pearl River County, Mississippi, case number 55CI1:21cv108 PH, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 4648402) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagwell v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Bagwell, Jr.
Represented By: Colette A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: John Anthony Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?