Davis v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Toni Davis
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00310
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeLashmet, W.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeLashmet, W.)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a four-week term of Court beginning on 9/6/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/24-25/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 4/8/2022. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2021. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2021. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 1/3/2022. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 2/3/2022. Motions due by 4/22/2022. Settlement Conference set for 6/30/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 8/17/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2022. EDT: 2-3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 11/3/2021 (SR)
November 3, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/3/2021 with attorneys James L. Davis III and W. Pemble DeLashmet. (SR)
November 2, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8: Advising attorney that the defendant's name is listed incorrect in the Notice. The defendant's name should be listed as it appears on the docket. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeLashmet, W.)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-party Subpoena - SMB Radiology, #2 Exhibit Non-party Subpoena - SRHS/Garden Park Med Ctr/Keystone Med Ctr, #3 Exhibit Non-party Subpoena - Merit Health Biloxi, #4 Exhibit Non-party Subpoena - MRI Center)(DeLashmet, W.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2021 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR) Modified on 10/7/2021 (SR).
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Toni Davis (Davis, James)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Toni Davis (Davis, James)
October 6, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: (1) Scanned document contains blank page(s). PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing; and (2) There is only one defendant in this case therefore, et al. should not be included in the case style in future filed pleadings. It is not necessary to refile. (RLW)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeLashmet, W.)
October 4, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2: Advising attorney that in the future, defendant's name should be listed below the signature line as it appears on the docket or include the verbiage, incorrectly identified as Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (RLW)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeLashmet, W.)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from County Court of Harrison County, Mississippi, case number 24CO1:21cv935. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 4672152) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, Summons and Proof of Serfice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Davis
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?