McCoy v. Harrison County Adult Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Tosh McCoy
Defendant: Harrison County Adult Detention Center, Troy Peterson, Jail Officials A, B, C and Nurses A, B, C
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv00334
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter regarding Notice of Change of Address by Ronnie Tosh McCoy to 15094 County Barn Road, Gulfport, MS 39503. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Ordered that on or before December 21, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a written response to this Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 11/29/21. (JCH)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 11/29/21. (JCH)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 11/29/21. (JCH)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to NEF's of #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #5 Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert.(PSP3). Mail sent to Ronnie Tosh McCoy. (JCH)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Ronnie Tosh McCoy (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronnie Tosh McCoy (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 11/1/21. (RLW)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ronnie Tosh McCoy (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harrison County Adult Detention Center, Jail Officials A, B, C, Nurses A, B, C, Troy Peterson, filed by Ronnie Tosh McCoy (Attachments: #1 Grievance Form and Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Harrison County Adult Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Tosh McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Officials A, B, C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurses A, B, C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?