Juanico v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Juanico
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and John Does A-Z
Case Number: 1:2021cv00397
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Robert P Myers
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Vaughn, Ross)
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Vaughn, Ross)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a three-week term of Court beginning on 2/6/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17-19/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Discovery due by 8/5/2022. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2022. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 3/3/2022. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 4/6/2022. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 5/6/2022. Motions due by 8/19/2022. Settlement Conference set for 11/22/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 1/10/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2023. EDT: 2 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 2/3/2022 (SR)
February 3, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/3/2022 with attorneys Matthew G. Mestayer and Ross Douglas Vaughn. (SR)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Vaughn, Ross)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Jerry Juanico (Mestayer, Matthew)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Jerry Juanico (Mestayer, Matthew)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure by Jerry Juanico (Mestayer, Matthew)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
December 27, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2: Incorrect event chosen. This case was removed from state court, therefore the event code, Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) should have been used. The event is under Other Answers. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Vaughn, Ross)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Harrison County Circuit Court - Second Judicial District, case number A2402-2021-183. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 4728601) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juanico v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Juanico
Represented By: Matthew G. Mestayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ross Douglas Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?