Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Huntington Ingalls Industries
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. doing business as Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, NSC Technologies, LLC, Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. and Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 34 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. (AB)
March 2, 2022 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Gates, Adam)
March 1, 2022 Filing 32 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Gates, Adam)
March 1, 2022 Filing 31 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc..(Gates, Adam)
February 16, 2022 Filing 30 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by NSC Technologies, LLC.(Taylor, Robin)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying as moot Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc.'s #15 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has now filed an #22 Amended Complaint, which the parties agree renders the #15 Motion to Dismiss the original #1 Complaint moot. See Reply #29 at 3; Resp. #23 at 2. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on February 11, 2022. (ENW)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #28 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to First Amended Complaint. Defendant Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. answer is now due on or before 3/1/2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 2/11/22 (TS)
February 10, 2022 Filing 29 Rebuttal re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. (Gates, Adam)
February 10, 2022 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. (Gates, Adam)
February 10, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 29. Attorney is advised that based on the title of this document, it should have been filed as a Reply to Response to Motion. Attorney is not required to re-file. (JCH)
February 9, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Brooks Eason on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. (Eason, Paul)
February 8, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (Thompson-Federal Gov, William)
February 8, 2022 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re amended complaint. (RLW)
February 8, 2022 Remark: Original issued summonses for service and return were emailed to attorney. (RLW)
February 3, 2022 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Thompson-Federal Gov, William)
February 3, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Thompson-Federal Gov, William)
February 3, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Thompson-Federal Gov, William)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys Paul L. Bittner and Angela M. Courtwright be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant NSC Technologies, LLC in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 2/3/2022 (AB)
February 2, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Paul L. Bitter $100.00, receipt number 4757094 (RLW)
February 2, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Angela M. Courtwright to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4757167) by NSC Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Taylor, Robin)
February 2, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Paul L. Bittner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NSC Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Taylor, Robin)
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. (Gates, Adam)
January 21, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NSC Technologies, LLC (Taylor, Robin)
January 21, 2022 Filing 17 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by NSC Technologies, LLC.(Taylor, Robin)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. (Gates, Adam)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Nicolas Schuck, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Edmond Hughes, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Edmond Hughes)(Gates, Adam)
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00429. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re: #12 Stipulation filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. The Court hereby TRANSFERS venue of this case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi for further proceedings as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case in this Court upon transfer. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 01/10/2022. (srd) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
January 7, 2022 REFERRAL OF #12 Stipulation to Judge DuBose. (srd) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Scheduling and Transfer of Venue by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Thompson, William) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Upon Defendant's Objection to Prior Service (Thompson, William) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. served on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022 (Pearson, Gina) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Thompson, William) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission of Service Attempt (Attachments: #1 AO 398 - Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 - Waiver of the Service of Summons (Unexecuted)) (Thompson, William) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. NSC Technologies, LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Thompson, William) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Trent Thompson on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Thompson, William) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lee Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Elaine Pearson on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Pearson, Gina) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Huntington Ingalls Industries, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rucker, Marsha) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/10/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Huntington Ingalls Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Gina Pearson-Federal Gov
Represented By: Marsha Lynn Rucker-Federal Gov
Represented By: Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov
Represented By: William Trent Thompson-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. doing business as Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSC Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Paul L. Bittner - PHV
Represented By: Robin Banck Taylor
Represented By: Angela M. Courtwright - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Adam H. Gates
Represented By: Paul Brooks Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Adam H. Gates
Represented By: Paul Brooks Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?