Williams-Noone v. Debristech, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vitoria L. Williams-Noone
Defendant: Debristech, LLC, Stephen Ballew and John or Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv00343
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vitoria L. Williams-Noone. Stephen Ballew served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (Van Cleave, Christopher)
January 30, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vitoria L. Williams-Noone. Debristech, LLC served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023. (Van Cleave, Christopher)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stephen Ballew, Debristech, LLC. (JCH)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Stephen Ballew, Debristech, LLC, John or Jane Does 1-10 (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 5009643), filed by Vitoria L. Williams-Noone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
December 21, 2022 Issued summons emailed to attorney to email address listed on docket. (JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams-Noone v. Debristech, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitoria L. Williams-Noone
Represented By: Christopher C Van Cleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debristech, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?