McDonald v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Janie McDonald
Defendant: Brewer Law Office, P.L.L.C. and Danielle Brewer Jones
Case Number: 1:2024cv00326
Filed: October 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Bradley W Rath
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answers are due by 12/20/2024. (AL)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #5 . Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 by December 20, 2024. This is an adequate amount of time given that Defendants were served with service of process on October 28, 2024. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 12/5/2024 (AL)
December 2, 2024 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Janie McDonald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice Letter to Danielle Brewer Jones With Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Owen, Mitchell)
November 27, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Danielle Brewer Jones, Brewer Law Office, P.L.L.C. (Jones, Danielle)
October 30, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janie McDonald. Brewer Law Office, P.L.L.C. served on 10/28/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (Owen, Mitchell)
October 30, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janie McDonald. Danielle Brewer Jones served on 10/28/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (Owen, Mitchell)
October 22, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brewer Law Office, P.L.L.C., Danielle Brewer Jones. (RLW)
October 22, 2024 Remark: Original issued summonses for service and return were emailed to attorney to address on docket. (RLW)
October 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brewer Law Office, P.L.L.C., Danielle Brewer Jones (Filing fee $405.00, receipt number 5527871), filed by Janie McDonald (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie McDonald
Represented By: Mitchell Lance Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewer Law Office, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: Danielle Brewer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Brewer Jones
Represented By: Danielle Brewer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?