Mabus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Donald Richard Mabus, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: General Counsel SSA-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2025cv00047
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Deadlines and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on March 12, 2025 (SK)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on March 12, 2025 (SK)
March 5, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of attorney appearance and substitution by Commissioner of Social Security (Kemp-Federal Gov, Kerry)
March 5, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: Based on the title of the document, the event code, Notice (Other) should have been selected. Also, the case number on document is incorrect. (RLW)
March 5, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5: The verbiage in the docket entry should have been the same as the title of the document. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
March 3, 2025 Filing 4 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry J. Kemp-Federal Gov on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Kemp-Federal Gov, Kerry) Modified on 3/5/2025 (RLW).
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Richard Mabus, Jr (wld)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Donald Richard Mabus, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Richard Mabus, Jr.
Represented By: Leanna Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov
Represented By: Kerry J. Kemp-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: General Counsel SSA-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?