Gulf Restoration Network v. City of Hattiesburg
Plaintiff: Gulf Restoration Network
Defendant: City of Hattiesburg
Case Number: 2:2012cv00036
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Hattiesburg Office
County: Forrest
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying 174 Motion to Compel Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/26/2017 (dtj)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER. Plaintiff is to respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel 174 by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, July 25, 2017. If Defendant wishes to file a reply, it may do so before noon on Wednesday, July 26, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/24/2017 (dtj)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 160 Motion for leave to conduct depositions of EPA officials and to serve additional discovery on Plaintiff. The Court hereby extends the discovery period in this matter to July 31, 2017.Both parties may serve additional discovery requests upon the opposing party, but such discovery requests must be served on or before July 17, 2017. Responses to these requests must be provided on or before July 21, 2017. Any supplemental expert reports must be produced to opposing party on or before July 31, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/13/2017 (dtj)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to Motion for Leave 160 to conduct certain discovery on or before July 12, 2017, and Defendant may reply on or before July 14, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/10/2017 (dtj)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/12/2017 (dtj)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. Scheduling Order to address the pending Motion to Terminate 90 the Amended Consent Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/31/2017 (dtj)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 98 Motion to Strike. If Plaintiff wishes to file a sur-reply in response to the arguments allegedly raised for the first time in reply, it may do so on or before March 27, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/20/2017 (dtj)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER. Defendant shall file a response to the Motion to Strike 98 on or before March 9, 2017. If Plaintiff wants to file a reply, it may do so within seven days of the filing of Defendant's Response, but no later than March 16, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/24/2017 (dtj)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying Defendant City of Hattiesburg and Intervenor Mississippi Commission on Environmental Quality's 8 16 Motions to Dismiss. Counsel is directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge John M. Roper within seven days of the entry of this opinion to schedule a case management conference. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on November 6, 2012 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf Restoration Network v. City of Hattiesburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Restoration Network
Represented By: Cynthia M. Sarthou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hattiesburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?