Guy v. Fornea 5, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert E. Guy
Defendant: Fornea 5, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00146
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion in Limine Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/14/2017 (dtj)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Response to Motion in Limine 46 is due on or before February 10, 2017. If Defendant wishes to reply, it may do so on or before noon on February 14, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/8/2017 (dtj)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/9/2017 (dtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Fornea 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Guy
Represented By: John H. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fornea 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?