Grain Dealers Mutual Insurance Company v. Cooley et al
Plaintiff: Grain Dealers Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Tammy Cooley, Walter Cooley and Sunrise Trading Post, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00039
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. Plaintiff has until on or before March 2, 2017 to respond to 68 Objection and Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Order. If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, they may do so on or before March 9, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/17/2017 (dtj)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. Responses to Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment are due on or before February 17, 2017. If Movants want to reply, they must do so within seven days of the filing of the response, but no later than February 24, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/6/2017 (dtj)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 2, 2017. (js)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Compel; and denying 51 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 6, 2017. (js)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grain Dealers Mutual Insurance Company v. Cooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grain Dealers Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn Etheridge Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Trading Post, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?