Walker et al v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Debra K. Walker and Prentiss Walker
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00042
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Lamar
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 146 Motion in Limine Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/12/2017 (dtj)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and deferring ruling in part 81 Motion to Strike the testimony of Lacy Sapp and George Carter. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/7/17. (cb)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and deferring in part 88 Motion to Exclude Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/6/2017 (dtj)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants the motion as to Plaintiffs' punitive damages claim, but the Court denies it in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/3/17 (cb)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion to Strike and/or Exclude the testimony of Plaintiff's expert and treating physician, Dr. Stephen Lambert. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/21/2017 (dtj)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's proposed expert, Chris Herring Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/14/2017 (dtj)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying 77 Motion to Strike Plaintiff Debra Walker's Supplemental Answers to its First Set of Interrogatories. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/13/2017 (dtj)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/7/2017 (dtj)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. Defendant shall respond to Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer and Motion for Summary Judgment for alleged discovery violations 102 on or before May 31, 2017. Plaintiff may file a reply on or before June 7, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/18/2017 (dtj)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Permission to File Specified Exhibit Under Seal Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/24/2017 (dtj)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to Motions 77 , 78 , 81 , 83 , 85 and 90 on or before May 4, 2017. Defendant wants to reply, it must do so within seven days of the filing of Plaintiff's responses, but no later than May 11, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/21/2017 (dtj)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 44 Motion to Strike. The parties shall immediately contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker to schedule a teleconference regarding the modifications to the scheduling order. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 12, 2016 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Monte L. Barton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra K. Walker
Represented By: Timothy M. Farris
Represented By: Kenneth D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentiss Walker
Represented By: Timothy M. Farris
Represented By: Kenneth D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?