Jordan v. Wayne County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jordan
Defendant: Wayne County, Mississippi and Jody Ashley
Case Number: 2:2016cv00070
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/13/2017 (dtj)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/17/2017 (dtj)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to Motion for Summary Judgment 28 on or before April 17, 2017. If Defendants want to reply, they must do so within seven days of filing of Plaintiff's response, but no later than April 24, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/4/2017 (dtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Wayne County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jordan
Represented By: Daniel M. Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?